1ST RAYLEIGH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 280781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required