1ST RAYLEIGH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 280781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £16.49k £27.61k £30.42k £27.64k £33.86k
Total expenditure £11.22k £29.46k £25.34k £26.95k £27.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £800 £9.05k £500 N/A