Financial history ST HELENA HOSPICE LIMITED

Charity number: 280919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.46m £11.87m £14.04m £16.41m £17.04m
Total expenditure £12.91m £13.67m £13.79m £15.38m £16.15m
Income from government contracts £0 £340.03k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.41m £3.11m £3.64m £3.83m £7.52m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.65m £1.80m £2.48m £2.91m £2.10m
Income - Other trading activities £5.50m £6.06m £7.06m £8.56m £6.86m
Income - Charitable activities £3.78m £3.76m £4.25m £4.70m £7.91m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £300.75k £254.13k £249.76k £229.00k £174.00k
Income - Other £223.88k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.92m £1.17m £1.89m £2.06m £1.12m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.97m £8.90m £8.30m £10.12m £11.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.94m £4.77m £4.41m £5.26m £4.93m
Expenditure - Governance £80.61k £63.61k £86.84k £110.00k £233.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £234.35k £109.38k £2.97k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £1.08m £0 £0