CRAFTS COUNCIL

Charity number: 280956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.04m £4.28m £4.17m £4.32m £4.37m
Total expenditure £3.91m £4.34m £3.98m £3.71m £4.10m
Income from government contracts £62.78k £3.35k N/A £60.18k £2.52m
Income from government grants £2.66m £2.58m £2.53m £2.55m N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.78m £3.00m £2.69m £2.78m £2.78m
Income - Other trading activities £251.54k £282.34k £298.61k £274.67k £437.50k
Income - Charitable activities £1.01m £1.00m £1.13m £1.20m £1.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £467 £346 £86 £1.38k £2.18k
Income - Other £0 £0 £50.00k £56.17k £72.55k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.49m £3.83m £3.36m £3.20m £3.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds £348.45k £426.72k £373.17k £309.40k £297.36k
Expenditure - Governance £78.21k £65.83k £78.52k £36.57k £41.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £69.90k £77.19k £253.53k £201.87k £185.46k