CRAFTS COUNCIL

Charity number: 280956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Olayinka Ayorinde Ilori Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
Majeda Clarke Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Michael Eden Trustee 19 December 2013 None on record
BRUCE BROWN Trustee 01 July 2014 None on record
Helen Hyde Trustee 12 March 2020
THE UFTON COURT EDUCATIONAL TRUST Received: On time
Matt Durran Trustee 01 July 2014 None on record
Philip Matthews Trustee 01 February 2021 None on record
CLARE TWOMEY Trustee 01 July 2014
THE CLAY FOUNDATION Received: On time
CRAFT POTTERY CHARITABLE TRUST
Dr Zoe Laughlin Trustee 01 July 2014 None on record
Professor Geoffrey Crossick Chair 19 December 2013
THE NATIONAL FILM AND TELEVISION SCHOOL Received: On time
THE HORNIMAN PUBLIC MUSEUM AND PUBLIC PARK TRUST Received: On time
Kathleen Jackson Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Andrew Marshall Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record
Reyahn King Trustee 06 December 2018 None on record