THE ARTS SOCIETY OF WEST SUFFOLK

Charity number: 281081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required