THE FROYLE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 281141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £11.37k £12.47k £10.56k £11.09k £10.08k
Total expenditure £8.59k £8.38k £8.46k £8.66k £8.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £1.50k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £700 £1.45k £0 £1.75k £3.36k