Trustees THE FROYLE VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 281141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Robertson | Chair | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Louise Munt | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Birn | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Paul | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Jones | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Robertson | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Royston Annible | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
William Knowles | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Cindy Dennis | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Toby Fay | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Zorab | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Karen Potter | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
||||
MR CHARLIE FINDLAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS RUDWICK WHINES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.