Trustees SREE NARAYANA GURU MISSION OF THE UK
Charity number: 281388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GOVINDAN SASIKUMAR | Chair | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Leela Dileepkumar | Trustee | 22 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Manilal Sivanandan | Trustee | 22 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peethamparan Arun | Trustee | 22 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Naryanan Sudevan | Trustee | 22 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suja Gopinathan | Trustee | 22 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ushakumari Prasobhkumar | Trustee | 22 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jayan ran | Trustee | 28 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOSE VISWAMBARAN | Trustee | 28 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Arjun Divakaran | Trustee | 28 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
THANKAPPAN KISHORKUMAR | Trustee | 28 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
BINOYELAL PILLAI | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bhaskaran Sureshbabu | Trustee | 21 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
VISWAMBHARAN SARASAN | Trustee | 18 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR TG SASIDHARAN | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
KARUNAKARAN THANKARAJ | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
VALSALA THANKAPPAN | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
BAIJU SANTHASEELAN | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
PEETHAMBARAN ARUN | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
RAGHAVAN VINODBABU | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
GANGADHARAN SURESHKUMAR | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHAJI SIVANANDAN | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JYOTHIPRAKASH NARAYANAN | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SURESH DHARMARAJAN | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.