Governing document SHERINGHAM AND CROMER CHORAL SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/12/1980 AS AMENDED ON 28/01/2008 AS AMENDED ON 09/09/2013 as amended on 26 Nov 2018 as amended on 20 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CHORAL CONCERTS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NORTH NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.