Trustees SHERINGHAM AND CROMER CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 281467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPHINE CAROLINE HURRELL | Chair | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elaine Twigg | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN HUGH ANDERSON | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
REVD DR MICHAEL EDWARD BOSSINGHAM | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA JEAN THOMPSON | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAREN ELIZABETH SIMS | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Green | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ADAMS | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.