THE MILDENHALL AND DISTRICT MUSEUM

Charity number: 281511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/01/2017 01/01/2018 01/01/2019 01/01/2020 01/01/2021
Total gross income £2.45k £2.26k £5.55k £3.26k £1.05k
Total expenditure £7.39k £6.00k £5.46k £6.22k £723
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A