HERTFORDSHIRE CHORUS

Charity number: 281627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 11 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 13 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 06 June 2017 On time Download