HERTFORDSHIRE CHORUS

Charity number: 281627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £126.45k £112.72k £104.61k £88.00k £93.48k
Total expenditure £113.16k £119.87k £105.79k £82.48k £80.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.52k £0 N/A N/A N/A