WELFARE AND RELIEF FOR UNDER PRIVILEGED CHILDREN IN INDIA

Charity number: 281689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 01 October 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 07 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2015 27 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 Not Required