WELFARE AND RELIEF FOR UNDER PRIVILEGED CHILDREN IN INDIA

Charity number: 281689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019
Total gross income £4.30k £5.50k £4.84k £4.80k £4.63k
Total expenditure £4.80k £5.90k £5.00k £4.96k £4.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A