ST EDMUND HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 281972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £13.06k £13.01k £13.22k £13.19k £11.71k
Total expenditure £9.89k £12.11k £12.73k £13.27k £11.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A