Financial history CHARVILLE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 282060
Charity reporting is overdue by 51 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £25.46k £32.73k £48.41k £27.65k £28.27k
Total expenditure £28.90k £31.23k £35.74k £16.07k £25.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k £10.38k £12.37k