Accounts and annual returns CHARVILLE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 282060
Charity reporting is overdue by 45 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 45 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 45 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 13 July 2023 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 13 July 2023 135 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 21 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 21 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 10 May 2021 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 10 May 2021 71 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 10 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window