Accounts and annual returns SALISBURY AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 282088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 09 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 28 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 10 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required