Financial history SALISBURY AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 282088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £496 £691 £1.12k £808 £4.91k
Total expenditure £853 £534 £736 £1.19k £967
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A