ST EDMUNDSBURY NEWSTALK ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 282332
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.82k £5.33k £4.47k £5.83k £18.78k
Total expenditure £5.72k £6.14k £4.53k £5.20k £7.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k