ST KEYNE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 282564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £10.93k £14.18k £11.60k £13.28k £21.86k
Total expenditure £11.32k £9.22k £13.56k £11.52k £8.09k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k N/A £1.00k N/A £17.39k