BELLJOE TZEDOKO LIMITED

Charity number: 282726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £955.25k £436.06k £725.96k £858.16k £951.70k
Total expenditure £732.98k £430.84k £726.15k £507.99k £645.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £580.73k N/A £187.00k £359.27k £393.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £374.52k N/A £411.72k £498.89k £558.70k
Income - Other £0 N/A £127.33k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £732.28k N/A £726.15k £507.99k £645.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.60k N/A £18.02k £44.73k £22.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £727.68k N/A £708.13k £463.26k £623.50k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £702 N/A £0 £0 £0