Financial history FAITH TEMPLE CHURCH OF CHRIST

Charity number: 283023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.00k £8.00k £7.00k £6.29k £2.90k
Total expenditure £3.00k £2.00k £6.00k £1.68k £1.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A