Financial history TRURO THREE ARTS SOCIETY

Charity number: 283130
Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £19.58k £40.69k £20.28k £4.68k £14.65k
Total expenditure £19.91k £19.22k £20.31k £6.24k £17.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A