ANADARUS LIMITED

Charity number: 283181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £441.59k £26.39k £315.00k £289.58k £602.89k
Total expenditure £199.95k £332.33k £375.44k £349.63k £412.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £602.89k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £2
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £602.89k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £412.52k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £407.70k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0