Financial history THE FARNHAM SOCIETY

Charity number: 283335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £179.38k £33.25k £14.31k £15.67k £9.87k
Total expenditure £131.49k £43.26k £16.63k £27.85k £8.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A