Financial history THE BANCROFT PLAYERS

Charity number: 283439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £119.10k £143.16k £122.07k £87.40k £103.91k
Total expenditure £105.48k £136.13k £88.60k £50.22k £45.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £65.41k