THE DAVID BROOKE CHARITY

Charity number: 283658
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £92.75k £110.32k £122.03k £131.65k £116.53k
Total expenditure £108.49k £128.93k £145.60k £128.21k £142.01k