REFUGEE ACTION

Charity number: 283660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.54m £5.15m £6.50m £7.26m £6.12m
Total expenditure £10.49m £5.63m £6.75m £7.53m £6.55m
Income from government contracts £140.00k £1.55m £2.82m £2.95m £1.80m
Income from government grants £9.00m £1.57m £1.61m £1.71m £1.64m
Income - Donations and legacies £943.00k £1.35m £971.00k £1.09m £1.14m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £9.59m £3.80m £5.53m £6.16m £4.98m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.00k £6.00k £2.00k £5.00k £6.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.84m £4.60m £5.93m £6.71m £5.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £654.00k £1.02m £822.00k £820.00k £737.00k
Expenditure - Governance £42.00k £39.00k £41.00k £41.00k £41.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0