Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF DONHEAD

Charity number: 284059
Charity reporting is overdue by 354 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 354 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 354 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 07 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 16 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 October 2020 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 21 October 2020 113 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 24 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window