STEVENAGEN CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 284221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 13 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 September 2019 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 28 June 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required