FRIENDS OF ASHBURTON PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 284245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 25 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 19 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required