Financial history FRIENDS OF ASHBURTON PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 284245
Charity reporting is overdue by 325 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £8.39k £6.92k £5.23k £36.41k £4.14k
Total expenditure £5.13k £7.80k £8.63k £1.46k £20.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A