Trustees THE MUSIC LIBRARIES TRUST

Charity number: 284334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MS Sally Groves Chair 19 October 2017
LISTEN PONY LTD
Received: On time
THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF MUSICIANS OF GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
UPROAR
Received: On time
THE MICHAEL TIPPETT MUSICAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE VAUGHAN WILLIAMS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
OPERA VENTURES
Received: On time
THE JOYCE AND MICHAEL KENNEDY AWARD FOR THE SINGING OF RICHARD STRAUSS
Received: On time
THE PETER MAXWELL DAVIES TRUST
Received: On time
Kathryn Adamson Trustee 31 January 2022
None on record
Sarah Akroyd Trustee 08 June 2020
None on record
George Vass Trustee 29 October 2018
THE NOVA MUSIC TRUST
Received: On time
Jenny Goodwin Trustee 09 February 2016
None on record
Barbara Flynn Trustee 09 February 2016
None on record
NICHOLAS WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record
RICHARD CHESSER Trustee
None on record
LEWIS FOREMAN Trustee
None on record
HELEN MASON Trustee
None on record
PAM THOMPSON Trustee
None on record