Accounts and annual returns THE LEANDER TRUST

Charity number: 284631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 11 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 05 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window