Financial history THE LEANDER TRUST

Charity number: 284631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £31.11k £239.39k £60.27k £83.32k £86.19k
Total expenditure £19.73k £35.88k £98.65k £48.97k £75.88k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A