SUDBURY NEWSTALK

Charity number: 284646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £411 £439 £1.69k £612 £1.38k
Total expenditure £1.88k £1.47k £1.07k £2.15k £579
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A