Financial history CLEEVE CHORALE

Charity number: 284752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £6.92k £6.71k £8.26k £9.62k £7.79k
Total expenditure £6.27k £6.73k £6.71k £8.08k £6.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A