BANGLADESH ISLAMIC CENTRE ST ALBANS

Charity number: 285054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £116.54k £110.81k £93.99k £80.15k £37.23k
Total expenditure £118.00k £86.60k £120.17k £65.16k £47.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £13.20k