Accounts and annual returns SEWELL PARK PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 285219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 07 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 02 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 10 November 2020 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required