SEWELL PARK PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 285219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £1.01k £1.03k £1.84k £668 £333
Total expenditure £687 £1.84k £844 £644 £1.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A