ALEXANDRA PALACE ORGAN APPEAL

Charity number: 285222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 22 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required