ALEXANDRA PALACE ORGAN APPEAL

Charity number: 285222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £16.69k £12.69k £11.96k £11.48k £13.16k
Total expenditure £6.57k £3.99k £3.55k £5.77k £13.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A