Financial history NORTH LONDON HOSPICE

Charity number: 285300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £12.38m £9.42m £13.07m £17.07m £14.97m
Total expenditure £10.16m £10.98m £12.66m £12.89m £13.47m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.14m £3.34m £4.87m £8.47m £5.84m
Income - Donations and legacies £6.13m £3.10m £4.88m £5.90m £5.27m
Income - Other trading activities £2.74m £2.56m £2.68m £1.37m £3.41m
Income - Charitable activities £3.23m £3.44m £5.17m £8.78m £5.94m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £253.51k £274.74k £299.57k £229.93k £242.33k
Income - Other £30.88k £41.90k £31.14k £795.22k £97.65k
Income - Legacies £4.19m £1.39m £3.25m £4.14m £2.47m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.50m £8.26m £9.79m £10.05m £10.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.62m £2.68m £2.83m £2.82m £3.09m
Expenditure - Governance £16.96k £19.30k £18.03k £19.31k £22.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £30.93k £53.89k £50.06k £51.20k £58.32k
Expenditure - Other £44.16k £33.37k £36.80k £21.10k £130.52k