CHICHESTER DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR FAMILY SUPPORT WORK

Charity number: 285337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYNNE PROSSER WATKINS Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST AUGUSTINE'S, SCAYNES HILL Received: On time
ALYSON HEATH Chair 03 October 2015
THE LITTLE BOOKWORMS LIMITED Overdue by 83 days
EDUCATION WEST AFRICA Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PULBOROUGH Received: On time
CHURCH SCHOOLMASTERS AND SCHOOLMISTRESSES' BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION Received: On time
Peter Graham Baker Trustee 19 July 2018 None on record
Sharon Philips Trustee 19 July 2018 None on record
MRS PAT FOWLER Trustee 05 January 2012 None on record
Rev Andrew Graham James Birks Trustee 22 October 2020 None on record
Lesley Jane Lynn Trustee 05 April 2019 None on record
DAVID JOHN PETER FISH Trustee 15 July 2013
THE HIGHMEAD CHRISTIAN FOUNDATION Received: On time
CYPRUS HALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Rev PAUL ROBERT SEAMAN Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PULBOROUGH Received: On time