Accounts and annual returns BURROUGH TRUST FOR ST JAMES' CHURCH HALSE

Charity number: 285796
Charity reporting is overdue by 229 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 229 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 229 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 March 2020 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required