Financial history BURROUGH TRUST FOR ST JAMES' CHURCH HALSE

Charity number: 285796
Charity reporting is overdue by 236 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7 £10 £12 £11 £1
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A