THE MANNA HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 286358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 07 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 03 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 03 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 08 August 2019 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 08 August 2019 9 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 01 August 2018 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 01 August 2018 2 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 31 July 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 July 2017 1 days late Download